Guest stevenbec Posted 25 June , 2004 Share Posted 25 June , 2004 Mates, Can anyone supply some Bio details on this officer? I have Richard Hylton Howard-Vyse Royal Horse Guards BrigGen, GSO HQ 5 Div in France and GSO DMC HQ in Egypt. I also have him later MajGen KCMG DSO. Do you have anything on his Boer War service or anything in between. Thanks S.B Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
rflory Posted 25 June , 2004 Share Posted 25 June , 2004 According to Services of Officers, 1920 his only war services were in the Great War. He was not commissioned until 10 Dec 1902 so that pretty well leaves out the South African War. He was promoted to Maj Gen on 10 Nov 1933 and retired on 30 Apr 1935 with a KCMG and DSO. The last two years of his service (1934-1935) were spent as Chief of Staff to HRH Duke of Gloucester during his tour of of Australia and New Zealand for which he received the KCMG. Regards. Dick Flory Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
Guest stevenbec Posted 25 June , 2004 Share Posted 25 June , 2004 Thanks Dick, I have him as 31 years old in 1917 and coming from Northampton UK. Do you have any Info on his birth and home? He made General quickly do you have his rank progresion. S.B Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
rflory Posted 25 June , 2004 Share Posted 25 June , 2004 Steven: He was born on 27 June 1883, the son of Howard Henry Howard-Vyse of Stoke Place, Slough, Bucks. His full name is Richard Granville Hylton Howard-Vyse. 2nd Lt - 10 Dec 02 Lieut, - 6 Apr 04 Captain - 4 Apr 08 Brevet Major - 3 Jun 16 Substantive Major - 5 Jun 19 Brevet Lt. Col. - 3 Jun 17 Substantive Lt. Col. - 1 Feb 22 Temp. BGen - 17 Aug 17 to 25 Feb 19 Maj Gen - 10 Nov 33 Regards. Dick Flory Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
Guest stevenbec Posted 25 June , 2004 Share Posted 25 June , 2004 Many Thanks again Dick, On the off chance you may have it ? Do you have his Appiontments in Army units during the war. I have only him being commisioned in the RHG and later GSO 5 Div in France and GSO DMC in Egypt. Cheers S.B Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
rflory Posted 28 June , 2004 Share Posted 28 June , 2004 Steven wrote: Do you have his Appiontments in Army units during the war. I have only him being commisioned in the RHG and later GSO 5 Div in France and GSO DMC in Egypt. Brigade Major, Northern Command and France from 4 May 14 to 11 Jun 15 GSO2, France from 12 Jun 15 to 21 May 16 GSO1, France, from 22 May 16 to 1 Aug 17 Brig. Gen., General Staff, EEF from 17 Aug 17 to 16 Jul 18 Brig Gen, Brigade Commander, EEF from 17 Jul 18 to 20 Sep 18 Commandant, Zeitoun School of Instruction, EEF from 7 Dec 18 to 25 Feb 19 Regards. Dick Flory Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
Recommended Posts
Create an account or sign in to comment
You need to be a member in order to leave a comment
Create an account
Sign up for a new account in our community. It's easy!
Register a new accountSign in
Already have an account? Sign in here.
Sign In Now