Raster Scanning Posted 24 January , 2004 Share Posted 24 January , 2004 The officer at the front is 2/Lt Steven Lloyd Trevor. I have written on the back "Lt attached to MGC 1916" Not sure were I got this info from as I have had the picture for years. Probably from the Army List, can anyone confirm this please. In the unit history he is listed as sailing with the regiment for France on 9th June 1915. The history also gives a list of names of NCO's & men who transferred to the 9th Machine Gun Squadron, did Trever also transfer? The picture was taken in Essex during the Spring of 1915. Thanks . John. Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
Raster Scanning Posted 24 January , 2004 Author Share Posted 24 January , 2004 Close up. Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
Staffsyeoman Posted 24 January , 2004 Share Posted 24 January , 2004 9 Sqn was formed on 26 Feb 1916, the MG Sqn of 9 Bde, 1st Cav Div. It was created from the MG sections of the 15 H, 19 H and the Bedfordshire Yeomany and was commanded on formation by Captain Reginald H Settle. Disbanded Dec 1919 at The Curragh. Pte Harry (Herbert George) Columbine of 9 Sqn was awarded a posthumous VC for an action at Hervilly Wood on 22 Mar 18, where he manned a gun in an exposed position for four hours, latterly completely alone. Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
hmsk212 Posted 24 January , 2004 Share Posted 24 January , 2004 John London Gazette Website Bedfordshire Yeomanry Lt S L Trevor is seconded for duty with MGC 09/03/1916 MGC Training Centre To be Assistant Instructor Lt S L Trevor (Bedfordshire Yeomanry TF) from 10/03/1916 to 04/09/1916 Lt S L Trevor Seconded for duty with Labour Corps 10/10/1917 Lt S L Trevor (Bedfordshire Yeomanry TF) To be Acting Captain 10/10/1917 Lt SL Trevor to be Captain (with precedence from 01/06/1916) To remain seconded to Labour Corps 09/07/1918 Bedfordshire Yeomanry Capt S L Trevor restored to Establishment 19/07/1919 Hope this helps. Steve Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
Raster Scanning Posted 25 January , 2004 Author Share Posted 25 January , 2004 Pil And Steve thanks. You have answered my questions. I was particularly interested to see if he was seconded, or left the BIY permanently and became a member of the MGC. I checked my list out of interest, Harry Columbine was not ex BIY. Best wishes. John. Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
bedfordyeoman Posted 18 September , 2004 Share Posted 18 September , 2004 Somewhat belatedly adding to what has gone before - The only son of William Trevor of Lathbury, Newport Pagnell, Stephen Trevor went to Eton, married Lady Olivia Buchan, daughter of the 18th Earl of Caithness, in 1920, resigned his commission with the BY in 1921, played County cricket for Bucks in the 20s, had one son David born 1929 and died in 1959. Sorted ! PS Nice photograph ! Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
Raster Scanning Posted 20 September , 2004 Author Share Posted 20 September , 2004 Hi BY Welcome, it seems we share an interest. Do we also bid against each other on ebay? Thanks for the additional info on Trevor. Best wishes. John. Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
Recommended Posts
Create an account or sign in to comment
You need to be a member in order to leave a comment
Create an account
Sign up for a new account in our community. It's easy!
Register a new accountSign in
Already have an account? Sign in here.
Sign In Now